Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2717.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mendoza. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2717.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2216.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2015
|
Set for hearing August 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
August 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1855.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Set for hearing July 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1733.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Set for hearing July 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after June 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|