Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2016 | February 2 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | Set for hearing February 2. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | January 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | Set for hearing January 21 in APPR. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2016 | Set for hearing January 19 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2016 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after September 18. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |