Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 72.) (September 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | Set for hearing September 8. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | September 1 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2015 | Set for hearing September 1. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2015 | August 19 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2015 | Set for hearing August 19. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | From Printer. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. To print. |