Senate
|
08/05/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5644.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3618.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|