California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR105 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/17/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 105CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 19 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 17, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 14, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 10, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 10, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Mendoza (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brough, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) FEBRUARY 2, 2016 Relative to Pakistani American Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 105, Mendoza. Pakistani American Day. This measure would proclaim March 23, 2016, as Pakistani American Day and would urge all Californians to join in celebrating Pakistani American Day. WHEREAS, Pakistan proclaimed its independence on August 14, 1947, and has fostered a close relationship with the United States of America; and WHEREAS, Pakistan's history of sovereign independence was a great step forward for the cause of freedom and the country's history has inspired, supported, and assisted nations around the world in their pursuit of liberty, justice, and equality; and WHEREAS, With diligence, fortitude, and an enduring belief in the American dream, Pakistani immigrants have helped to turn emergent areas within the State of California into thriving and respectable communities, while raising their children to be productive Pakistani Americans; and WHEREAS, Pakistani Americans have become an integral part of mainstream American society and have made important contributions as Californians in the fields of finance, technology, law, medicine, education, sports, media, the arts, the military, and government, as well as other areas; and WHEREAS, There remains much to be done to ensure that Pakistani Americans have access to resources, have a voice in the United States government, and continue to advance in the political landscape of the United States; and WHEREAS, Celebrating Pakistani American Day provides the people of California with an opportunity to recognize the achievements, contributions, and history of Pakistani Americans, and to appreciate the challenges and opportunities before Pakistani Americans; and WHEREAS, As the Pakistani American community prepares for a new era and creates a new history, Pakistani Americans must instill in younger generations the proper appreciation for the courage and values of their forefathers, a deep sense of affinity with their roots, and pride in their own cultural heritage so that they may better contribute to the great State of California, rich with ethnic and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March 23, 2016, as Pakistani American Day, and urges all Californians to join in celebrating Pakistani American Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.