Senate | 03/28/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3980.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3069.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |