Senate | 06/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5489.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3289.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |