Senate | 08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |