Senate | 05/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4690.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3627.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |