Senate | 08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |