Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5599.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4396.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hertzberg. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |