Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 26).
|
|
|