Senate | 05/12/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3799.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4597.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3459.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |