Senate | 05/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4690.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3662.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |