LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR125
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR125
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR125
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
04/19/2016
April 20 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
04/08/2016
Set for hearing April 20.
Senate
04/07/2016
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Senate
03/31/2016
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.