Senate | 06/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Page 5278.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3739.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |