Senate | 05/24/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4872.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3662.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |