Senate | 04/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 856.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 138.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 26). |