Senate | 06/13/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4957.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3735.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |