Senate | 05/20/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3629.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |