Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |