Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5598.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |