LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR137
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR137
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR137
Compare Versions
SCR137 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR137 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR137 Amended June 22, 2016
SCR137 Amended June 8, 2016
SCR137 Introduced May 2, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR137 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR137 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR137 Amended June 22, 2016
SCR137 Amended June 8, 2016
SCR137 Introduced May 2, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare