Senate | 08/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6245.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22). | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5065.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |