Senate | 06/13/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 6). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3959.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |