Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4870.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Set for hearing August 1. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4614.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2016 | Set for hearing June 28. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |