Senate | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6515.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4870.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Set for hearing August 1. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4494.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Set for hearing June 21. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |