California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR148 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/10/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 148CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 101 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 10, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Bates (Coauthors: Senators Block, Fuller, Hertzberg, and Leno) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Chang, Chvez, Dodd, Cristina Garcia, Lackey, and Wagner) JUNE 2, 2016 Relative to Crosswalk Safety Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 148, Bates. Crosswalk Safety Awareness Month. This measure would designate October as Crosswalk Safety Awareness Month. WHEREAS, The State of California has in the past initiated statewide programs designed to promote safety through education and training; and WHEREAS, The Legislature desires to reinforce and emphasize crosswalk safety for students and child safety on public roads by dedicating a month to crosswalk safety awareness; and WHEREAS, It is incumbent on all drivers to pay focused attention to the well-being of everyone using a crosswalk; and WHEREAS, Children and adults are encouraged to walk in crosswalks when crossing the street and to observe crosswalk rules, including to look before entering, walk not run, not text or wear headsets, and stay alert as to oncoming traffic; and WHEREAS, The state has adopted the concept of "complete streets" in roadway design to promote other modes of traffic, including walking and bicycling; and WHEREAS, So that the lives of all those lost in crosswalks are remembered, in particular the three children who lost their lives on Halloween night 2014; and WHEREAS, Californians should feel safe and protected any time they walk and need to cross roadways; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims that the month of October be designated as Crosswalk Safety Awareness Month in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.