Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4870.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2016
|
Set for hearing August 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4621.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Set for hearing June 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
June 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Set for hearing June 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|