Senate | 09/18/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/18/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2564.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13). | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1753.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |