Senate | 08/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5372.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6165.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |