Senate | 08/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5886.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 2). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4508.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |