Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5137.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4894.) (August 11). | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | August 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | Set for hearing August 11. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 4838.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Set for hearing August 9. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |