Senate | 04/07/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 483.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 263.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |