Senate | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6519.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5029.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |