BILL NUMBER: SCR 164CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 149 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 26, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leyva AUGUST 3, 2016 Relative to California Firefighters Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 164, Leyva. California Firefighters Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim October 15, 2016, as California Firefighters Memorial Day. WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial, located on the grounds of the State Capitol, serves to honor and commemorate California firefighters who unwaveringly serve our great state with pride, courage, and honor; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is also a symbol of gratitude and appreciation to the men and women of the fire service who put their lives on the line each day to protect the people, property, and beauty of California; and WHEREAS, Each of the approximately 1,300 names engraved on the brushed limestone walls of the California Firefighters Memorial serves as a timeless tribute to the finest and bravest of our state who have made the ultimate sacrifice as firefighters; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is the only state monument capturing the names of those courageous firefighters in California who have put service to our great state of California above all else, and it shall continue this legacy in perpetuity; and WHEREAS, Many of the fallen firefighters whose names adorn the California Firefighters Memorial suffered and ultimately succumbed to diseases, such as cancer, as a result of the hazardous nature of their work, including routine exposure to toxic chemicals; and WHEREAS, On October 15, 2016, hundreds of firefighters and their families from throughout the state will gather in Sacramento with their fellow Californians for the California Firefighters Memorial Ceremony 2016 to honor the men and women of the fire service who have selflessly given their lives to protect California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims October 15, 2016, as California Firefighters Memorial Day and urges Californians to always remember firefighters who have given their lives in the line of duty and to express appreciation to firefighters who continue to protect our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.