Senate | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5560.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 30). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5137.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |