Senate | 02/27/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Page 397.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 189.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected February 17). |