BILL NUMBER: SCR 20CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 54 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 4, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Galgiani (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Bates, Block, Hall, Hertzberg, Leno, Monning, Roth, and Vidak) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Travis Allen, Brough, Chu, Dahle, Dodd, Frazier, Gordon, Grove, Lackey, Linder, and Waldron) FEBRUARY 23, 2015 Relative to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 20, Galgiani. California Peace Officers' Memorial Day. This measure would designate Monday, May 4, 2015, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, and would urge all Californians to honor those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families. WHEREAS, Monday, May 4, 2015, is California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers' Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job that is second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2014 be recognized: Detective Sergeant Tom A. Smith, Jr., BART Police Department, End of Watch: January 21, 2014. Officer Juan J. Gonzalez, CHP - Fresno Area Office, End of Watch: February 17, 2014. Officer Brian M. Law, CHP - Fresno Area Office, End of Watch: February 17, 2014. Officer Nicholas C. Lee, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: March 7, 2014. Deputy Ricky P. Del Fiorentino, Mendocino County Sheriff's Office, End of Watch: March 19, 2014. Officer Christopher A. Cortijo, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: April 9, 2014. Officer Roberto C. Sanchez, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: May 3, 2014. Officer Scott M. Hewell, Stockton Police Department, End of Watch: June 11, 2014. Officer Jordan J. Corder, Covina Police Department, End of Watch: September 30, 2014. Deputy Danny P. Oliver, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: October 24, 2014. Detective Michael D. Davis, Jr., Placer County Sheriff's Office, End of Watch: October 24, 2014. Detective Yevhen "Eugene" Kostiuchenko, Ventura County Sheriff's Office, End of Watch: October 28, 2014. Officer Shaun R. Diamond, Pomona Police Department, End of Watch: October 29, 2014; and be it further Resolved, That California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled, also be recognized: Officer Arthur W. Moyle, South San Francisco Police Department, End of Watch: May 4, 1953. Officer Clarence A. Bower, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: December 5, 1944. Officer Robert B. Ross, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: September 24, 1921. Officer Fran Toal, Vallejo Police Department, End of Watch: September 2, 1896. Deputy George W. Gillis, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department: End of Watch, January 12, 1881; and be it further Resolved, That the California Legislature designates Monday, May 4, 2015, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.