Senate | 07/16/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |