Senate | 05/05/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 830.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1107.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 377.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |