Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 908.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|