BILL NUMBER: SCR 28CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 128 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 22, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 16, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 13, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 9, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff (Coauthor: Assembly Member Kim) MARCH 9, 2015 Relative to the Fullerton Police Detective Tommy De La Rosa Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 28, Huff. Fullerton Police Detective Tommy De La Rosa: Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the interchange at Interstate 5 and State Highway Route 91 in the City of Fullerton as the "Fullerton Police Detective Tommy De La Rosa Memorial Interchange." The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Fullerton Police Detective Tommy De La Rosa, at 43 years of age, paid the ultimate sacrifice in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Detective De La Rosa was born on May 12, 1947, and served his country during the Vietnam War while in the Marine Corps. Detective De La Rosa joined the Fullerton Police Department on September 26, 1980; and WHEREAS, While off duty, Detective De La Rosa liked to speak with children from neighborhoods heavy with drugs, gangs, and prostitution and urge them to be good and stay in school; and WHEREAS, On June 21, 1990, Detective De La Rosa was ambushed and shot five times during an undercover reverse sting narcotics operation, but, although gravely injured, was still able to return fire and fatally wound one of the suspects before succumbing to his injuries. Three other suspects were convicted of Detective De La Rosa' s murder and were sentenced to life without parole; and WHEREAS, Detective De La Rosa is survived by his wife and four children. The most important thing in Detective De La Rosa's life was his family; and WHEREAS, Detective De La Rosa provided the public with exemplary service and dedication to his job throughout his nine-year career with the Fullerton Police Department; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to memorialize the service and sacrifice of Detective De La Rosa, by designating the interchange at Interstate 5 and State Highway Route 91 in the City of Fullerton in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the interchange at Interstate 5 and State Highway Route 91 in the City of Fullerton as the "Fullerton Police Detective Tommy De La Rosa Memorial Interchange"; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.