Senate | 02/03/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 120.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 199.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 22). | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 80.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 12/08/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |