Senate | 04/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 978.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 358.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |