Senate | 05/18/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1454.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 557.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |