Senate | 07/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 630.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |