LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR36
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR36
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
04/28/2015
May 5 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
04/21/2015
Set for hearing May 5.
Senate
04/16/2015
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
Senate
04/06/2015
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.