Senate | 06/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2090.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 879.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |