Senate | 02/19/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 310.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 9). | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 80.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |